+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-98.
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Mr. Smith moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
- The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to agree in the Senate amendment to H.R. 347 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 388 - 3 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On November 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 235.
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Mr. Lungren, Daniel E. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 347 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 399 - 3 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-9 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 2.
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor