+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On July 31, 1981 in the House:
- See H.R.3982 .
On May 22, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Human Resources.
On May 15, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development.
On May 12, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power.
On May 11, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Assistance and Unemployment Compensation.
On May 6, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
- Referred to House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor