+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On December 23, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by President.
On December 11, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7187-7188)
On September 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On September 21, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4559-4560)
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4559-4560)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3465.
- Ms. Haaland moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On August 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 373.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-466.
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
On December 4, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor