+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (46)
On October 26, 1996 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 104-331.
- Signed by President.
On October 18, 1996 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Clinger asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendments.
On October 4, 1996 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 3, 1996 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.5434 Proposed by Senator Lott for Senator Coats. To improve the remedial and enforcement provisions.
- Measure laid before Senate.
- Amendment SP 5434 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.5434 Amendment SP 5434 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
- Amendment SP 5434 proposed by Senator Lott for Senator Coats.
On September 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 636.
On September 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
On September 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On September 24, 1996 in the House:
- Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
- Reported by the Committee on Government Reform. H. Rept. 104-820 , Part I.
- House Committee on Economic and Educational Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 24, 1996.
- House Committee on Judiciary Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 24, 1996.
- House Committee on Veterans' Affairs Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 24, 1996.
- Committee on Economic and Educational discharged.
- Committee on Judiciary discharged.
- Mr. Horn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 448.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 410 - 5 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 25, 1996 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 16, 1996 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
On June 25, 1996 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 30, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Education, Training, Employment and Housing.
On May 21, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Information and Technology.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service.
On May 17, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
On May 14, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Economic and Educational Opportunities
- Referred to House Government Reform and Oversight
- Referred to the Committee on Government Reform and Oversight, and in addition to the Committees on Economic and Educational Opportunities, the Judiciary, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.5434
To improve the remedial and enforcement provisions.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor