+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On May 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On April 13, 2000 in the House:
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 3439 .
- ORDER OF PROCEDURE - Mr. Dreier asked unanimous consent that it be in order for the Speaker to declare the House resolved into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union for consideration of H.R. 3439 as follows: the first reading of the bill shall be dispensed with; general debate shall not exceed one hour; the Commerce amendment printed in the bill shall be an original bill for the purpose of amendment under the five-minute rule and shall be considered as read; points of order against the committee amendment in the nature of a substitute for failure to comply with clause 7 of rule XVI are waived; the bill be open to amendment; ordered votes may be postponed and clustered; the previous question shall be as ordered; motion to recommit allowed; H. Res. 474 shall be laid on the table. Agreed to without objection.
- Consideration initiated by previous order of the House.
- The House resolved into Committee of the Whole on the state of the Union pursuant to previous special order.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable Ray LaHood to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- Considered by previous order of the House.
- H.AMDT.672 Amendment offered by Mr. Barrett . Amendment sought to allow the FCC to modify the rules to eliminate or reduce the minimum distance separations for third-adjacent channels six months after the Commission submits a study to Congress that examines whether low-power FM radio stations result in harmful interference to existing stations.
- H.AMDT.672 On agreeing to the Barrett amendment Failed by recorded vote: 142 - 245 .
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 3439 .
- On passage Passed by recorded vote: 274 - 110 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On April 12, 2000 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 472 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3439 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Makes in order the Committee on Commerce amendment in the nature of a substitute, now printed in the bill, as an original bill for the purpose of amendment. Measure will be considered read. Bill is open to amendments.
On April 10, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 312.
- Reported by the Committee on Commerce. H. Rept. 106-567 .
On March 29, 2000 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 23, 2000 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 30, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection.
On November 17, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Commerce.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.672
Amendment sought to allow the FCC to modify the rules to eliminate or reduce the minimum distance separations for third-adjacent channels six months after the Commission submits a study to Congress that examines whether low-power FM radio stations result in harmful interference to existing stations.
+ − Votes (2)
April 13, 2000: On Agreeing to the Amendment
- Yeas: 142
- Nays: 245
- Absent: 47
April 13, 2000: On Passage
- Yeas: 274
- Nays: 110
- Absent: 50
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor