+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On June 8, 1988 in the House:
- Rule Failed of Passage in House.
On June 2, 1988 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H.Res.466 Reported to House.
- Committee on Rules Granted a Modified Closed Rule Providing Three Hours of General Debate; Waiving All Points of Order.
On November 18, 1987 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H.Res.314 Reported to House.
- Committee on Rules Granted a Modified Closed Rule Providing Four Hours of General Debate; Making in Order the Text of H.R.2762 as an Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute; Waiving all Points of Order.
- Committee on Rules Granted a Modified Closed Rule Providing Four Hours of General Debate; Makingin Order the Text of H.R.2762 as an Amendment in the Nature of a Sub stitute; Waiving All Points of Order.
On October 28, 1987 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 263.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Education and Labor. Report No: 100-409.
On October 15, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 6, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor