+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 388.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 108-644 .
On July 14, 2004 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 17, 2004 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 3, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health.
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On October 31, 2003 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On October 30, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor