+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4320 Amendment SA 4320 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4320 Amendment SA 4320 proposed by Senator Lott for Senator Snowe. To reauthorize the Coastal Zone Management Act and the Atlantic Striped Bass Conservation Act, and for other purposes.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On June 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On June 26, 2000 in the House:
- Mr. Sherwood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3417 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 400 - 3, 2 Present .
On April 11, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 314.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-569 .
On March 15, 2000 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans Discharged.
On November 18, 1999 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Commerce.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
On November 17, 1999 in the House:
- Oversight hearing held by Subcommitee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans before introduction of bill .
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.4320
To reauthorize the Coastal Zone Management Act and the Atlantic Striped Bass Conservation Act, and for other purposes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor