+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 9, 2000 in the House:
- Became Private Law No: 106-12.
- Signed by President.
On November 2, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 28, 2000 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 27, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On October 3, 2000 in the House:
- Called up from the Private Calendar for consideration.
- Considered from the Private Calendar.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 26, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on the Private Calendar, Calendar No. 13.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 106-892 .
On September 19, 2000 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 27, 2000 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 30, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
On November 16, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor