+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 112-160.
- Signed by President.
On August 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On August 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On June 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On June 28, 2012 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 26, 2012 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Clay objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3412 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Farenthold moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor