+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On December 15, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On December 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
On November 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On November 15, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
On November 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Foreign Affairs
- Referred to House Homeland Security
- Referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor