+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On January 8, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-238.
- Signed by President.
On December 30, 1987 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On December 21, 1987 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 21, 1987 in the Senate:
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Voice Vote.
On December 20, 1987 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 19, 1987 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.1372 Amendment SP 1372 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1372 Proposed by Senator Byrd for Senator Pryor. To amend chapters 83 and 84 of title 5, United States Code, to provide for the participation of certain employees under the Federal Employees Retirement System to provide for a refund of certain excess deductions, to amend provisions relating to retirement credit for employees, government contributions to Thrift Savings Plans, adjustments in methods of annuity payments, and for other purposes.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
On October 22, 1987 in the Senate:
- Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 390.
On October 21, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On October 19, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On October 15, 1987 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 233.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service. Report No: 100-374.
On October 10, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits.
On October 6, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 1, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.1372
To amend chapters 83 and 84 of title 5, United States Code, to provide for the participation of certain employees under the Federal Employees Retirement System to provide for a refund of certain excess deductions, to amend provisions relating to retirement credit for employees, government contributions to Thrift Savings Plans, adjustments in methods of annuity payments, and for other purposes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor