+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
On July 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to section 8 of H. Res. 504, and the motion offered by Mr. McGovern, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 1500, as amended; H.R. 2471, as amended; H.R. 3261; H.R. 3283, as amended; and H.R. 3385, as amended; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 186; and H. Res. 402, as amended. (consideration: CR H3258-3262; text: CR H3260-3261)
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: Pursuant to section 8 of H. Res. 504, and the motion offered by Mr. McGovern, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 1500, as amended; H.R. 2471, as amended; H.R. 3261; H.R. 3283, as amended; and H.R. 3385, as amended; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 186; and H. Res. 402, as amended.(consideration: CR H3258-3262; text: CR H3260-3261)
- Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 504, proceedings on H.R. 3385 are considered vacated.
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3385.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3220-3222; text: CR H3220)
- Ms. Dean moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (94)
Type:
Primary Sponsor