+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On December 1, 2022 in the House:
- The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) and the bill pursuant to the rule.
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- Amendment reported by the House Committee on Rules.
- On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- Amendment agreed to by House: On agreeing to the Scanlon amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote.
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Scanlon amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote.
- House amendment offered/reported by: Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. Scanlon.
On December 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On December 1, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. Scanlon. (consideration: CR H8686; text: CR H8686)
- House amendment offered
- On agreeing to the Scanlon amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1499. (consideration: CR H8679-8686; text: CR H8679-8681)
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3372, H.R. 6878, H.R. 8876 and H.J. Res. 100. The resolution provides for adoption of H. Res. 1495 and H. Con. Res. 118.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3372.
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 1499, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Scanlon amendment No. 1.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 3372, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Jordan demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8693-8694)
- Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 259 - 167 (Roll no. 492).
On December 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 259 - 167 (Roll no. 492).
On November 30, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1499 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3372, H.R. 6878, H.R. 8876 and H.J. Res. 100. The resolution provides for adoption of H. Res. 1495 and H. Con. Res. 118.
On November 25, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 424.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-584.
On July 21, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor