+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 27, 1991 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On November 23, 1991 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On November 23, 1991 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Pickle moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 26, 1991 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 134.
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 102-224.
On September 25, 1991 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 19, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor