+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence, Emerging Threats & Capabilities.
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
On December 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
On November 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On October 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
On October 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6809)
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, House Administration, the Judiciary, Rules, Appropriations, Science, Space, and Technology, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Armed Services
- Referred to House Rules
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to House Administration
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Appropriations
- Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology
- Referred to House Foreign Affairs
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor