+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On December 19, 1980 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-552.
- Signed by President.
On December 9, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On December 9, 1980 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On December 4, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On December 4, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On December 3, 1980 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services, S. Rept. 96-1049.
On September 3, 1980 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Armed Services.
On August 26, 1980 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On June 25, 1980 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Armed Services, H. Rept. 96-1127.
On March 29, 1979 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor