+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 28, 1976 in the Senate:
- Public law 94-424.
- Signed by President.
On September 17, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On September 17, 1976 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On September 16, 1976 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On September 16, 1976 in the Senate:
- House agreed to Senate amendment.
On September 13, 1976 in the Senate:
- Call of calendar in Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On May 14, 1976 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 94-891.
On June 17, 1975 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On June 16, 1975 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
On June 12, 1975 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs with amendment, H. Rept. 94-286.
On February 19, 1975 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor