+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On May 7, 1990 in the House:
- Field Hearings Held in Burlington, Vermont.
On March 5, 1990 in the House:
- Field Hearings Held by the Subcommittee in Carbondale, Illonois.
On January 12, 1990 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Education.
On November 16, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 13, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Select Education.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Employment Opportunities.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary and Vocational Education.
On September 26, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor