+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- Star Print ordered on the bill.
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 366 - 60 (Roll no. 133). (text: CR H4538-4540)
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 366 - 60 (Roll no. 133).
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4557)
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3344.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4538-4541)
- Mr. Connolly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Energy, the Environment and Cyber.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E555)
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor