+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On March 11, 1982 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 20, 1981 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From VA.
On September 10, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 6, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD, VA.
On April 30, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor