+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 113-250.
- Signed by President.
On December 13, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- S.Amdt.4093 Amendment SA 4093 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Introduced in Senate
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6607-6608)
- S.Amdt.4093 Amendment SA 4093 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator King. (consideration: CR S6607-6608; text: CR S6607-6608)
- Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6607)
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 11, 2014 in the House:
- Mrs. Wagner asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H10303-10304)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H10303-10304)
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3424)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3329.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3424-3426)
- Mrs. Capito moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On November 14, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
S.Amdt.4093
In the nature of a substitute.