+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 3, 2020 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 116-199. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On November 24, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7081)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 448.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On October 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On October 16, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8175)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3329.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8175-8176)
- Mr. Rouda moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On July 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor