+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 9, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-641.
- Signed by President.
On November 1, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 28, 1988 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 20, 1988 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.3749 Amendment SP 3749 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3749 Proposed by Senator Byrd for Senator Burdick. To make a technical correction.
- S.AMDT.3748 Amendment SP 3748 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3748 Proposed by Senator Dole for Senator Durenberger. To provide for regulations for a handicapped parking system.
- Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On October 20, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 19, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On December 18, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
On December 15, 1987 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar No: 114.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Public Works and Transportation. Report No: 100-480.
On December 10, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 8, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 5, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds.
On September 22, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
+ − Amendments (2)
S.AMDT.3748
To provide for regulations for a handicapped parking system.
S.AMDT.3749
To make a technical correction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor