+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy.
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Natural Resources, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Armed Services
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce