+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On April 21, 1994 in the House:
- See H.R.4092 .
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Crime and Criminal Justice Held Hearings on Titles I, II, III, IV, V, VI, IX, X, and XI.
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Crime and Criminal Justice Held Hearings on Titles I, II, III, IV, V, VI, IX, X, and XI.
On November 5, 1993 in the House:
- Title VIII referred to the Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights.
- Titles I, II, III, IV, V, VI, IX, X, and XI referred to the Subcommittee on Crime and Criminal Justice.
On October 28, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
On October 19, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor