+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 30, 1990 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 101-259.
- Signed by President.
On March 26, 1990 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On March 23, 1990 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On March 21, 1990 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 20, 1990 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On March 20, 1990 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On March 9, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Burdick without amendment. Without written report.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 482.
On March 8, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Approved for reporting without amendment favorably.
On November 22, 1989 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On November 18, 1989 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On November 17, 1989 in the House:
- Mr. Applegate asked unanimous consent to discharge the House Calendar and consider.
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Reported by the Committee on Public Works + Transportation. H. Rept. 101-375.
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 88.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- H.AMDT.358 Amendment in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Applegate. Amendment in the nature of a substitute
- H.AMDT.358 On agreeing to the Applegate amendment Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 14, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On November 8, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 2, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds.
On September 20, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.358
Amendment in the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor