+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 21, 2019 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 116-47. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On August 13, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5205)
On July 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 162.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On July 17, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5956)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3305.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5956-5957)
- Mr. Rouda moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor