+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 13, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 113-49.
On November 6, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7778)
On October 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On October 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On October 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
- Subcommittee on Health Discharged.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6660)
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Mr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6660-6664)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3302.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (374)
Type:
Primary Sponsor