+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 25, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 113-132.
On July 15, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4355-4364; text as passed Senate: CR S4355)
On October 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 226.
On October 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6853-6854)
- Mr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 330.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6853)
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 26.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-79.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor