+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On September 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On September 22, 2008 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3299 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Ms. Bordallo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 29, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 511.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-793 .
On July 16, 2008 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
On July 10, 2008 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 7, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
On August 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor