+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 24, 1996 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 454.
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain with an amendment. With written report No. 104-288 .
On June 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. Committee ordered favorably reported Title III of the bill.
On June 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs pursuant to the order of May 23, 1996.
- Committee on Finance. Reported to Senate by Senator Roth with amendments. With written report No. 104-279 .
On June 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee on Finance. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On May 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- Ordered, if and when reported by the Committee on Finance the bill then be referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs for the purpose of considering Title 3, for a period of 10 days of session, to report or be discharged.
On May 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On May 10, 1996 in the House:
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 428 , the House proceeded with one hour of debate on the Young amendment.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- H.AMDT.1053 Amendment offered by Mr. Young . Amendment sought to strike title III which deals with the adoption of Indian children and Indian child custody proceedings.
- On passage Passed by recorded vote: 393 - 15 .
- H.AMDT.1053 On agreeing to the Young amendment Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 195 - 212 .
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On May 9, 1996 in the House:
- Mr. Hyde asked unanimous consent that during the consideration of the bill H.R. 3286 pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 428 , notwithstanding the order of the previous question, it may be in order immediately after initial debate on the bill as amended for the Chair to postpone further consideration of the bill until the following legislative day, on which consideration may resume at a time designated by the Speaker. Agreed to without objection.
- Rule H. Res. 428 passed House.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 428 .
- H.AMDT.1052 Amendment in the nature of a substitute offered by the Committee on Ways and Means. Amendment in the nature of a substitute
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3286 . Providing for the consideration of the bill in the House without intervention of any point of order. The amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means now printed in the bill shall be considered as adopted. The previous question shall be considered as ordered on the bill, as amended, and on any further amendment thereto to final passage without intervening motion except: 1. One hour of debate on the bill, as amended; 2. an amendment to title II of the billl, as amended, if offered by Representative Gibbons, debatable for 30 minutes; 3. the amendment recommended by the Committee on Resources, if offered by Representative Young , debatable for 30 minutes; 4. one motion to recommit, which may include instructions only if offered by the Minority Leader or his designee.
- H.AMDT.1052 Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 428 , the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means and printed in bill was considered as having been adopted.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate.
- UNFINISHED BUSINESS - Pursuant to the order of the House from earlier in the day, further proceedings on H.R. 3286 will continue on Friday, May 10, 1996.
On May 7, 1996 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 428 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3286 . Providing for the consideration of the bill in the House without intervention of any point of order. The amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means now printed in the bill shall be considered as adopted. The previous question shall be considered as ordered on the bill, as amended, and on any further amendment thereto to final passage without intervening motion except: 1. One hour of debate on the bill, as amended; 2. an amendment to title II of the billl, as amended, if offered by Representative Gibbons, debatable for 30 minutes; 3. the amendment recommended by the Committee on Resources, if offered by Representative Young , debatable for 30 minutes; 4. one motion to recommit, which may include instructions only if offered by the Minority Leader or his designee.
On May 3, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 267.
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 104-542 , Part II.
On May 1, 1996 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 30, 1996 in the House:
- Committee on Economic and Educational discharged.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 104-542 , Part I.
On April 25, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Youth and Families.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 23, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to House Economic and Educational Opportunities
- Referred to House Resources
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Resources, and Economic and Educational Opportunities, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Amendments (2)
H.AMDT.1052
Amendment in the nature of a substitute.
H.AMDT.1053
Amendment sought to strike title III which deals with the adoption of Indian children and Indian child custody proceedings.
+ − Vote
May 10, 1996: On Passage
- Yeas: 393
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 25
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor