+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On December 12, 1989 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Presented to President.
On December 1, 1989 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On December 1, 1989 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 22, 1989 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to agree to Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Rostenkowski asked unanimous consent that the House agree to Senate amendment.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Voice Vote.
- Amendment SP 1218 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1218 Amendment SP 1218 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1218 Proposed by Senator Bentsen. To provide for duty-free importation of certain types of ethanol from beneficiary countries of the Caribbean Basin Economic Recovery Act, and for other purposes.
- Amendment SP 1218 proposed by Senator Bentsen.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 381.
On November 15, 1989 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on International Trade. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 101-645.
- Committee on Finance. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
- Committee on Finance. Reported to Senate by Senator Bentsen with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 101-206.
On October 27, 1989 in the Senate:
On October 3, 1989 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On October 2, 1989 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Mr. Pease moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- The chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
- Yeas and Nays were ordered. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays : 354 - 10 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 27, 1989 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 166.
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 101-263.
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 19, 1989 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 15, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
On September 14, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.1218
To provide for duty-free importation of certain types of ethanol from beneficiary countries of the Caribbean Basin Economic Recovery Act, and for other purposes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor