+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 325.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 108-460 , Part IV.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 108-460 , Part III.
On June 16, 2004 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 14, 2004 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 108-460 , Part II.
- House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 21, 2004.
- House Committee on Judiciary Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 21, 2004.
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 21, 2004.
On June 5, 2004 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
On June 3, 2004 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- House Committee on Judiciary Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 14, 2004.
- House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 14, 2004.
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 14, 2004.
On June 2, 2004 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 1, 2004 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 2, 2004 in the House:
- Referred sequentially to the House Committee on Science for a period ending not later than April 2, 2004 for consideration of such provisions of the bill and amendment as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause , rule X.
- Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security . H. Rept. 108-460 , Part I.
- House Committee on Judiciary Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 7, 2004.
- Committee on Science discharged.
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 7, 2004.
- House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 7, 2004.
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 37 - 0.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 20, 2003 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 27, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On October 22, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On October 16, 2003 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 14, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness and Response.
On October 9, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On October 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Homeland Security
- Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security , and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor