+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On July 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to section 7 of H. Res. 535, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 678; H.R. 1036; H.R. 1079, as amended; H.R. 1158; H.R. 1250; H.R. 1754; H.R. 1833, as amended; H.R. 1850; H.R. 1871; H.R. 1877, as amended; H.R. 1893; H.R. 1895; H.R. 2118; H.R. 2795, as amended; H.R. 2928; H.R. 2980, as amended; H.R. 3003; H.R. 3138, as amended; H.R. 3223; H.R. 3263; and H.R. 3264; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 277; and H. Res. 294. (consideration: CR H3715-3730; text: CR H3728-3729)
On July 20, 2021 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: Pursuant to section 7 of H. Res. 535, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 678; H.R. 1036; H.R. 1079, as amended; H.R. 1158; H.R. 1250; H.R. 1754; H.R. 1833, as amended; H.R. 1850; H.R. 1871; H.R. 1877, as amended; H.R. 1893; H.R. 1895; H.R. 2118; H.R. 2795, as amended; H.R. 2928; H.R. 2980, as amended; H.R. 3003; H.R. 3138, as amended; H.R. 3223; H.R. 3263; and H.R. 3264; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 277; and H. Res. 294.(consideration: CR H3715-3730; text: CR H3728-3729)
- Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 535, proceedings on H.R. 3264 are considered vacated.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3264.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3703-3705; text: CR H3703-3704)
- Ms. Clarke (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 33.
- Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 117-50.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability Discharged.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor