+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On November 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
On November 2, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On October 28, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On October 26, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On October 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Homeland Security
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor