+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 7, 1999 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-141.
- Signed by President.
On November 30, 1999 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 22, 1999 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 19, 1999 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On November 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On November 16, 1999 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 401 - 0 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3257 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Reynolds moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On November 8, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor