+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 24, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 365.
- Reported by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 105-649 .
On June 4, 1998 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 18.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 21, 1998 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Youth and Families.
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor