+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 31, 1992 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On July 30, 1992 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- H.AMDT.782 On agreeing to the Public Works + Transportation amendment Agreed to without objection.
- H.AMDT.782 Amendment in the nature of a substitute reported by the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation. Amendment in the nature of a substitute directs the FAA to provide for the charting of specific air routes to be used by general aviation pilots in order to transit or operate to and from airports in busy airspace.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Oberstar asked unanimous consent to discharge the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union and consider.
On July 24, 1992 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Public Works + Transportation. H. Rept. 102-712.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 403.
On July 1, 1992 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 25, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On December 9, 1991 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 15, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOT.
On August 2, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.782
Amendment in the nature of a substitute directs the FAA to provide for the charting of specific air routes to be used by general aviation pilots in order to transit or operate to and from airports in busy airspace.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor