+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 21, 2017 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 115-88. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On November 9, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7121)
On October 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On October 11, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 0 (Roll no. 563). (text: CR H7956)
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7958-7959)
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3243.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7955-7957)
- Mr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On October 10, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 249.
- Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-344.
On July 19, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Introduced in House