+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 23, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 365.
- Committee on Government Reform discharged.
- Reported by the Committee on National Security. H. Rept. 104-620 , Part II.
On July 17, 1996 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 11, 1996 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On July 2, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Information and Technology.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service.
On June 13, 1996 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Intelligence . H. Rept. 104-620 , Part I.
- Referred sequentially to the House Committee on Government Reform and Oversight for a period ending not later than July 23, 1996 for consideration of such provisions of the bill and the amendments recommended by the Committee on Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1, rule X.
- House Committee on National Security Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than July 23, 1996.
On May 9, 1996 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 16, 1996 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On April 15, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to House National Security
- Referred to House Intelligence
- Referred to the Committee on Intelligence , and in addition to the Committee on National Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor