+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 6, 1996 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 104-179.
- Signed by President.
On July 26, 1996 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 25, 1996 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 24, 1996 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On July 24, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On June 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 429.
On June 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On June 4, 1996 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Canady moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On May 29, 1996 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 104-595 , Part I.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 295.
- House Committee on Government Reform Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than May 29, 1996.
- Committee on Government Reform discharged.
On April 24, 1996 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 18, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Information and Technology.
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 15, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to House Government Reform and Oversight
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Government Reform and Oversight, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor