+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 25, 2004 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 108-245.
- Signed by President.
On June 16, 2004 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On June 9, 2004 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On June 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On June 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 555.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
On June 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On October 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On October 28, 2003 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3234 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mrs. Davis, Jo Ann moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On October 2, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor