+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On December 3, 1999 in the House:
- Became Private Law No: 106-003.
- Signed by President.
On November 23, 1999 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 22, 1999 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 19, 1999 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On July 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On July 20, 1999 in the House:
- Called up from the Private Calendar for consideration.
- Considered from the Private Calendar.
- H.AMDT.309 Amendment in the nature of a substitute offered by the Committee on Judiciary. Amendment in the nature of a substitute
- H.AMDT.309 On agreeing to the Judiciary amendment Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 9, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Private Calendar, Calendar No. 3.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 106-178 .
On May 19, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 4, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
On January 6, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.309
Amendment in the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor