+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 6, 2000 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-433.
- Signed by President.
On October 27, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 26, 2000 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 25, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On October 18, 2000 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 385 - 0 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On October 17, 2000 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed until Oct. 18.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3218 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Ose moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On November 17, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Information and Technology.
On November 5, 1999 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On November 4, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor