+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On December 17, 1993 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 103-200.
- Signed by President.
On December 8, 1993 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 26, 1993 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 24, 1993 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 24, 1993 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On November 22, 1993 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On November 21, 1993 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Waxman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On November 18, 1993 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 103-379, Part I.
On November 16, 1993 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 10, 1993 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 3, 1993 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On October 26, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On October 13, 1993 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On October 8, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime and Criminal Justice.
On October 5, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor