+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On May 23, 1990 in the House:
- For Further Action See H.R.3030 .
On October 19, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 18, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 11, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 6, 1989 in the House:
- Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Energy and Power Prior to Referral
- Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Energy and Power Prior to Referral
- Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Energy and Power Prior to Referral
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On August 4, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor