+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 115-173.
- Signed by President.
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment)
- Mr. Russell asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H3760-3761)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1768-1769)
- S.Amdt.2210 Amendment SA 2210 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.2210 Amendment SA 2210 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Johnson. (consideration: CR S1769-1770; text: CR S1769-1770) In the nature of a substitute.
- The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1768-1770)
On November 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-185.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 264.
On October 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On July 26, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6327)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3210.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6327-6328)
- Mr. Mitchell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 188.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-258.
On July 19, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 2210
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.2210
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor