+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 114-184.
- Signed by President.
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4287-4288)
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Mr. Paulsen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-542.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 418.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3209.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2189-2192)
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2189)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 27, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5520)
On July 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor