+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On January 2, 1975 in the House:
- Private Law 93-111.
- Signed by President.
On December 24, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On December 18, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On December 18, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On December 17, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 93-1384.
On May 8, 1974 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On May 6, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
On February 28, 1974 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, H. Rept. 93-830.
On January 29, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor